RI H7603 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the insurance commissioner to issue regulations prohibiting the use of credit histories, credit scores, occupation or educational level in setting auto insurance rates.
Title
Motor Vehicle Reparations Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7603.pdf |