RI H7595 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Meeting postponed (05/23/2018)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes compliance/certification procedure for criminal pre-trial discovery/creates a 9 member task force to investigate/make recommendations, pre-trial discovery with report due 1/1/20 and dissolution on 1/1/22.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trial

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-19HouseMeeting postponed (05/23/2018)
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration
2018-03-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018)
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback