RI H7594 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows a person to make satisfactory arrangements for the payment of motor vehicle fines or costs, and would permit a person to request an ability to pay hearing before a license is suspended for failure to pay such fines or costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspension Or Revocation Of Licenses - Violations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2018)
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback