RI H7593 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the family court, after a fact-finding hearing establishing paternity, to terminate the parental rights of a person convicted of sexual assault which resulted in the birth of a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption Of Children

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-05HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/05/2018)
2018-05-29HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/29/2018)
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback