RI H7590 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the chapter of the general laws regulating itinerant vendors and their various licensing requirements, responsibilities, and duties.
Title
Itinerant Vendors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/25/2016) |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-03-22 | House | House read and passed |
2016-03-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/22/2016) |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/16/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2016) |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Small Business |