RI H7584 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits disclosure in a civil action of a person's confidential health care information through ex parte contact with the provider or the provider's legal representative.
Title
Confidentiality Of Health Care Communications And Information
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7584.pdf |