RI H7581 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts any proposed retailers' Class B license to be located at 4 Market Street, Plat 3, Lot 74 in the town of Warren from the two hundred feet (200') requirement from the premises of schools or places of worship.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/12/2022) |
2022-04-07 | House | House read and passed |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/07/2022) |
2022-03-31 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-03-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/31/2022) |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2022) |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |