RI H7578 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a web-based caregiver support information center and adds certain elder services to those which are subject to training and support from the elderly affairs department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elderly Affairs Department

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-20HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-06-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-20HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-19HouseScheduled for consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-03-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
2018-03-06HouseMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback