RI H7572 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the state from requiring any form of the Federation of State Medical Boards' proprietary maintenance of licensure program.
Title
Patient Access Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] |
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7572.pdf |