RI H7569 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Require hospitals to offer flu vaccinations to all inpatient individuals sixty-five (65) years of age or older unless the person has a condition that would not allow such vaccination or if the vaccine is in short supply.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensing Of Health Care Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-15 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/15/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-03-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20HouseMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback