RI H7563 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - House voted to recommit to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a system of consumer protection for regulation by DBR of noninsurance business entities using or disclosing personal identifiable financial information for insurance sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Consumer Protection Sales Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23HouseHouse voted to recommit to House Corporations
2018-06-16HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-08HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2018)
2018-03-20HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018)
2018-03-12HouseMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback