RI H7562 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the alternate window for documents filed with the secretary of state to take effect is increased from up to thirty (30) days to up to ninety (90) days.
Title
The Rhode Island Limited Liability Company Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/31/2018) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2018) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2018-04-03 | House | House read and passed |
2018-03-30 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |