RI H7560 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eliminates the requirement that a waiver for fuel content standards be obtained from both weights and measures (DLT) and the department of environmental management (DEM).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retail Sale Of Gasoline

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseSigned by Governor
2018-06-13HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-13SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-08SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2018)
2018-05-30SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-05-24SenateScheduled for hearing (05/30/2018)
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
2018-05-22HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-18HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/22/2018)
2018-05-08HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for consideration (05/08/2018)
2018-03-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018)
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback