RI H7559 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Hearing: May 24 House Municipal Government Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows the Tiverton town council to grant, by ordinance, property tax credits and removes the current property assessment value-based tax exemptions for veterans, gold star parents and visually impaired persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-04-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-04-12HouseCommittee transferred to House Municipal Government
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback