RI H7557 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Smithfield to issue a total of five (5) Class A liquor store licenses.
Title
Class A Liquor Licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Christopher Millea [D] |
Rep. Bernard Hawkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-17 | House | House read and passed |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2020) |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |