RI H7554 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows William Bon Bauer to join Kaiplin Bauer and Gustazo Cabarcas in marriage on or about June 20, 2020, within the City of Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-06-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2020) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2020-03-05 | House | House read and passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |