RI H7551 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits cities and towns to borrow any amount from the School Building Authority Capital Fund to fund the LEA's share of total project costs without voter approval prior to July 1, 2016.
Title
Indebtedness Of Towns And Cities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Passage (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-04-26 | House | House read and passed |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/26/2016) |
2016-04-12 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016) |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |