RI H7550 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Human Trafficking Reporting and Prevention Act applicable to hotels requiring them to educate their employees about identifying, reporting and preventing human trafficking on their premises.
Title
Hotels--human Trafficking Reporting And Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/10/2020) |
2020-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2020) |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7550.pdf |