RI H7549 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that commencing fiscal year 2019 and thereafter, all state funds appropriated for educational purposes pursuant to this chapter would be in an amount not less than the amount of funds appropriated in the previous fiscal year.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7549.pdf |