RI H7547 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN SERVICES -- RHODE ISLAND CHILD CARE FOR ALL ACT - Establishes the Rhode Island Child Care for All Act which would provide high quality and affordable child care to families throughout the state.
Title
Establishes the Rhode Island Child Care for All Act which would provide high quality and affordable child care to families throughout the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7547.pdf |