RI H7547 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provided that the transition plan for education aid begun in fiscal year 2012 would be frozen in place at the rates and calculations in effect for the fiscal year commencing July 1, 2017.
Title
The Education Equity And Property Tax Relief Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7547.pdf |