RI H7543 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removes the requirement that each political party convene every two (2) years to adopt a platform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Party Conventions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-14HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-14SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-07SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/14/2018)
2018-06-05SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-01SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-05-16HouseHouse read and passed
2018-05-11HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/16/2018)
2018-05-09HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-04HouseScheduled for consideration (05/09/2018)
2018-03-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20HouseMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback