RI H7540 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the State False Claims Act to reflect amendments to the Federal False Claims Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedure Generally - The State False Claim Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseSigned by Governor
2018-07-02HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-19SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-12HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-06-06HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration (06/06/2018)
2018-04-11HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-06HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018)
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback