RI H7532 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the definition of sales to include any license, lease, or rental of prewritten or vendor-hosted computer software and specified digital products. This act would also define "end-user" for specified digital products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-24HouseSigned by Governor
2020-06-18HouseTransmitted to Governor
2020-06-18SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2020-06-17SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/18/2020)
2020-06-17HouseHouse passed Sub A
2020-06-15HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/17/2020)
2020-06-11HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2020-06-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2020)
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback