RI H7529 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-23 - Senate passed in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Legalizing Marijuana (extends The Reporting Date Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Legalizing Marijuana From March 1, 2018 To February 1, 2019, And Said Commission Expires On May 1, 2019.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Resolution Extending The Reporting And Expiration Dates Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Legalizing Marijuana (extends The Reporting Date Of The Special Legislative Commission To Study The Effects Of Legalizing Marijuana From March 1, 2018 To February 1, 2019, And Said Commission Expires On May 1, 2019.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-23SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-20SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-18SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2018)
2018-04-05SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-03-27HouseHouse read and passed
2018-03-20HousePlaced on House Calendar (03/27/2018)
2018-03-20HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018)
2018-03-12HouseMeeting postponed (03/13/2018)
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-06HouseMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback