RI H7528 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits auto manufacturers from preventing new car dealers from charging fees allowed under law, and also regulates warranty "charge backs" of claims.
Title
Regulation Of Business Practices Among Motor Vehicle Manufacturers, Distributors And Dealers
Sponsors
Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] |
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Regulation of business practices approval of amendment lc 004720/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2014-06-04 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2014) |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014) |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |