RI H7524 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of public safety to procure, subject to appropriation, an interoperable school safety emergency communications system that facilitates emergency response activities in the state.
Title
Department Of Public Safety--school Safety Emergency Communications System
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2020) |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7524.pdf |