RI H7523 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of litter to include commercial signs placed on public property or telephone poles, and allows the authorities to remove such signs without risk of criminal penalties or civil suits.
Title
Litter Control And Recycling
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7523.pdf |