RI H7522 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 23 House Judiciary Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the secretary of state to notify the appropriate elected official of a newly registered voter's most recent former place of residence, only if it is located outside of Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/23/2018)
2018-03-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-09HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018)
2018-03-06HouseMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-09HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback