RI H7517 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the rental period from thirty (30) days to six (6) days in regard to the exclusion from the definition of occupancy for any home, condominium or other residential dwelling rented.
Title
Tourism And Development
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2018) |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7517.pdf |