RI H7516 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the name of the drug court magistrate to the "Rhode Island superior court adult drug/recovery court magistrate and changes the name of the court to the "Rhode Island superior court adult drug/recovery court".
Title
Superior Court
Sponsors
Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Michael Morin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7516.pdf |