RI H7515 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the town of West Greenwich to create five (5) year tax liens on real estate owned by infirm and indigent persons in lieu of paying regular taxes where those persons have been determined as unable to pay by the assessor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Subject To Taxation - Exemption For Indigent And Infirm Persons In The Town Of West Greenwich

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2018-06-27HouseTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-20SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2018-06-20SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2018-06-15SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Senate Finance
2018-06-06HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/06/2018)
2018-05-24HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-05-18HouseScheduled for consideration (05/24/2018)
2018-04-26HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-17HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2018)
2018-04-12HouseCommittee transferred to House Municipal Government
2018-02-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback