RI H7513 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Invests the chief justice of the supreme court with the explicit authority to address issues affecting the conduct of judicial business and order whatever response(s) he or she deems necessary.
Title
Courts -- Court Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7513.pdf |