RI H7512 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a minor to bring specified malpractice actions at any time up to reaching twenty-one (21) years of age.
Title
Procedures Generally - Causes Of Action
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |