RI H7511 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the penalty of abating rent in cases where a non-resident landlord fails to designate an agent for service of process and would clarify that the fine for violating this section is civil.
Title
Relating To Property
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Senate voted to reconsider |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2018) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-05-30 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/30/2018) |
2018-05-23 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2018) |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |