RI H7510 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from receiving any portion of the tips given by customers to their tipped employees, with limited exceptions for credit card service charges.
Title
Tip Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-06-20 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |