RI H7510 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the entirety of ยง 11-22-9 which section imposes a fine on any animal drawn sled or sleigh when the operator lets the animal team go at large on a highway.
Title
Highways
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-12 | House | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7510.pdf |