RI H7507 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires schools to comply with recycling and composting laws and promotes the donation of unspoiled nonperishable food by schools. Requires the use of share tables at all schools.
Title
School Waste Recycling And Refuse Disposal
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7507.pdf |