RI H7506 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that the traffic tribunal would have exclusive jurisdiction for second and subsequent violations of blood test refusals related to a suspected DUI.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjudication Of Traffic Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-19HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/20/2018)
2018-06-19HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-16HouseScheduled for consideration (06/19/2018)
2018-02-27HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018)
2018-02-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback