RI H7505 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a new chapter and make several amendments to existing statutes providing for penalties for crimes against the public trust.
Title
Crimes Against The Public Trust
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018) |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7505.pdf |