RI H7502 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the current state provisions regarding notaries and adopts an adapted version of the "Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notaries Public And Justices Of The Peace

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29SenateSigned by Governor
2018-06-27SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-06-23HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2018-06-23HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-23SenateSenate passed Sub A
2018-06-22SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018)
2018-06-22SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22SenateScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-06-21SenateCommittee continued
2018-06-20SenateScheduled for consideration (06/21/2018)
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2018-06-12HouseHouse read and passed
2018-06-08HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/12/2018)
2018-06-05HouseCommittee recommends passage
2018-06-01HouseScheduled for consideration (06/05/2018)
2018-03-06HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/06/2018)
2018-02-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback