RI H7496 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Referred to Senate Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a procedure for individuals to file a revocable voluntary non-opiate directive form with the person's licensed health care practitioner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Controlled Substances Act -- Non-opiate Directive

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03SenateReferred to Senate Health and Human Services
2018-04-10HouseHouse passed Sub A
2018-04-06HousePlaced on House Calendar (04/10/2018)
2018-04-04HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-03-30HouseScheduled for consideration (04/04/2018)
2018-03-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-02-08HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback