RI H7496 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a procedure for individuals to file a revocable voluntary non-opiate directive form with the person's licensed health care practitioner.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act -- Non-opiate Directive
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Committee transferred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2018-04-10 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-04-06 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/10/2018) |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-03-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/04/2018) |
2018-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018) |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |