RI H7491 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes EOHHS to seek Medicaid section 1115 waivers or state-plan amendments to enhance support for unpaid family caregivers and requires EOHHS to submit annual reports to the house and senate finance committees and to post reports on EOHHS website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Caregivers Support Act Of 2013

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-04-18HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018)
2018-04-09HouseCommittee transferred to House H.E.W.
2018-02-07HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback