RI H7490 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows SNAP recipients to receive a minimum of $0.50 credit on their EBT card, for each $1.00 spent on fruits and vegetables also creates a separate SNAP fund to allocate funds from the general fund to effectuate this act.
Title
Public Assistance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2022) |
2022-04-25 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/28/2022) |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7490.pdf |