RI H7490 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires establishments selling drinks or food via drive-through windows to install at the ordering station serving each such window, equipment to be used to assist the deaf and hard-of-hearing in ordering, and train its personnel to use such equipment.
Title
Drive-through Windows -- Assistance To Deaf And Hard-of-hearing
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2016) |
2016-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7490.pdf |