RI H7486 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Restriction On Tolling (this Joint Resolution Would Propose A Constitutional Amendment Providing That Any New Highway Or Bridge Tolling Would Require Voter Approval Statewide And Also In The Municipalities Affected.)
Title
Joint Resolution To Approve And Publish And Submit To The Electors A Proposition Of Amendment To The Constitution -- Restriction On Tolling (this Joint Resolution Would Propose A Constitutional Amendment Providing That Any New Highway Or Bridge Tolling Would Require Voter Approval Statewide And Also In The Municipalities Affected.)
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Antonio Giarrusso [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7486.pdf |