RI H7481 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a public scorecard system to show how long-term care reform is meeting its goals of rebalancing the way services are delivered and moneys are spent on various service types.
Title
Medical Assistance - Long-term Care Service And Finance Reform
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-21 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2018) |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |