RI H7479 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates additional restrictions on the times for which caterers with a Class P license may serve alcohol.
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Jeremiah O'Grady [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018) |
2018-02-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7479.pdf |