RI H7475 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-22 - Referred to Senate Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all public utilities to maintain a customer service facility within the state to perform services such as addressing customer inquiries and accepting bill payments.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Commerce |
2022-06-22 | House | House read and passed |
2022-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-21 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |